|
06/27/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1268.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1115.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 854.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 738.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|