|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 2271.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 28. Page 2793.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 17. Page 1238.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1116.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 762.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|