01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/27/2011 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/13/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | |||
04/06/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/06/2011 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
04/05/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | |||
03/08/2011 | Set for hearing April 6. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | |||
02/16/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |||
02/15/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |