01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/26/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/20/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/02/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 2. | |||
04/05/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 541.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/15/2011 | Set for hearing April 5. | |||
03/14/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |||
12/07/2010 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6. | |||
12/06/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |