|
07/02/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 906.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 616.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|