California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB379 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2012

Amended

Bill August 20, 2012
Bill June 25, 2012
Bill June 12, 2012
Bill May 23, 2012
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill March 25, 2011