|
08/01/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 139, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/01/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/19/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2342.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 4. Page 704.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 452.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|