01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
01/10/2012 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 2624.) | |||
12/15/2011 | Set for hearing January 10. | |||
04/07/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/05/2011 | Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |||
03/15/2011 | Set for hearing April 5. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/16/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |||
02/15/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |