LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB390
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB390
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB390
Compare Versions
SB390 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB390 Enrolled August 16, 2011
SB390 Amended May 24, 2011
SB390 Amended April 7, 2011
SB390 Amended March 21, 2011
SB390 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB390 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB390 Enrolled August 16, 2011
SB390 Amended May 24, 2011
SB390 Amended April 7, 2011
SB390 Amended March 21, 2011
SB390 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare