01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/04/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
12/15/2011 | Set for hearing January 10. | |||
08/23/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
08/18/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/16/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |||
02/15/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |