01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/11/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/10/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/26/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/25/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/23/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 23. | |||
05/09/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/05/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 854.) (May 2). | |||
04/14/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |||
04/05/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. Set for hearing May 2. | |||
03/23/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 430.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |||
03/09/2011 | Set for hearing March 23. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and E.Q. | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |||
02/16/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |