01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/26/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/20/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
04/11/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/01/2011 | Set for hearing April 11. | |||
03/29/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/25/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 430.) (March 23). | |||
03/03/2011 | Set for hearing March 23. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |||
02/16/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |