01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/02/2011 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 854.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/15/2011 | Set for hearing May 2. | |||
04/14/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |||
04/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 4. Page 618.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/07/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
03/09/2011 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and RLS. | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |||
02/16/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |