01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/02/2011 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 855.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/28/2011 | Set for hearing May 2. | |||
04/26/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 8. Noes 4. Page 738.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |||
04/13/2011 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
04/12/2011 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 6. Noes 6. Page 618.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
03/10/2011 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E.Q. | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |||
02/16/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |