|
09/09/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 3112.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (September 1). (Committee report corrected September 2. Page 2872.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 2745.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2750.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1034.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 929.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 759.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|