|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 705, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 2742.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1227.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1116.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 415.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|