|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 738, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2143.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 2506.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 2393.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 1187.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 741.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 580.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2011
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/08/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|