01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/11/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/07/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 579.) (April 6). | |||
03/21/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | |||
03/08/2011 | Set for hearing April 6. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |||
02/16/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |