|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 2448.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 3040.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1240.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1116.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 415.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|