01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/26/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/25/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/23/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 23. | |||
05/10/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/09/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 885.) (May 4). | |||
04/29/2011 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
04/27/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
01/03/2011 | Read first time. | |||
12/09/2010 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 8. | |||
12/08/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |