|
10/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 420, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2141.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 3. Page 2257.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 906.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 621.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|