|
08/01/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/01/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/19/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2332.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 903.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 860.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 675.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|