|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 562, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 2149.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2343.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1033.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 543.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|