|
07/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1785.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2101.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1171.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 862.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|