|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 646, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2479.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3184.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2710.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1185.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 884.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 804.)
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 736.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|