|
08/25/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 1239.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1117.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 643.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|