01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/04/2011 | Set, second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |||
04/21/2011 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
03/29/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/16/2011 | Set for hearing March 30. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |||
02/16/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |