01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/03/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
03/31/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/24/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |||
02/16/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |