06/20/2011 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/13/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/27/2011 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV. | |||
05/19/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/19/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1038.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/12/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/11/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 951.) (May 10). | |||
05/03/2011 | Set for hearing May 10. | |||
04/28/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |||
02/16/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |