|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 2689.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 1243.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 675.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|