LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB443
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB443
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB443
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 16, 2011
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 15, 2012
Compare
Bill
May 31, 2011
Compare
Bill
May 17, 2011
Compare
Bill
April 26, 2011
Compare
Bill
March 24, 2011
Compare