|
07/12/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 2190.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 519.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 494.) (March 29).
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|