|
09/23/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4968.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6451.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6252.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2698.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2668.) (January 17).
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2640.) (January 10). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/09/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2012
|
Set for hearing January 10 in T. & H. pending receipt.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|