LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB45
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB45
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB45
Action History
01/31/2012
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
01/20/2011
Referred to Com. on G.O.
01/03/2011
Read first time.
12/09/2010
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 8.
12/08/2010
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.