|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2332.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 4. Page 2580.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 958.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 430.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|