01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/26/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/24/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/20/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/16/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/06/2011 | Set for hearing May 16. | |||
05/04/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/03/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 759.) (April 27). | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/08/2011 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
03/31/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/22/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |||
02/16/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |