|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 591, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2442.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 3042.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2816.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1269.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1117.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 848.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 542.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|