|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 706, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2412.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 2988.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 2824.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 1274.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1117.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 765.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 643.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|