|
08/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2005.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1111.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 761.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
Set for hearing March 16.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2011
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 9.
|
|
|
|
12/09/2010
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|