|
08/25/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1283.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1117.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 616.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|