01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/06/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/30/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
03/29/2011 | Set for hearing April 6. (Reconsideration - Vote only.) | |||
03/23/2011 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 4. Page 430.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
03/03/2011 | Set for hearing March 23. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |||
02/16/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |