|
08/16/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 1239.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1117.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 739.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|