|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 2776.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 1185.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 855.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 559.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|