01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
03/17/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/16/2011 | Set for hearing May 11. | |||
03/07/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
03/03/2011 | Set for hearing March 23. | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
01/03/2011 | Read first time. | |||
12/14/2010 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 13. | |||
12/13/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |