08/25/2011 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
07/13/2011 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/30/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/29/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |||
06/09/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
06/01/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/31/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1186.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/24/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/23/2011 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
05/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 23. | |||
05/10/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 850.) (May 4). | |||
04/21/2011 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
03/24/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/21/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |