|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 707, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
(Enrolled measure version corrected.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2401.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 2936.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2769.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 1216.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 960.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 972.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|