01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/13/2011 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/01/2011 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
03/10/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/09/2011 | Set for hearing March 23. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |