|
07/14/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 2189.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 651.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 559.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 426.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
Set for hearing March 16.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2011
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/14/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 13.
|
|
|
|
12/13/2010
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|