01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/10/2011 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |||
05/06/2011 | Set for hearing May 10. | |||
04/28/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/20/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/16/2011 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |