LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB486
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB486
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB486
Action History
01/31/2012
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
04/12/2011
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/23/2011
Set for hearing April 13.
03/03/2011
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F.
02/18/2011
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
02/17/2011
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.